WORLD ASSOCIATION OF GIRL GUIDES AND GIRL SCOUTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The World Association of Girl Guides and Girl Scouts is dedicated to girls and young women in the world. Our diverse Movement represents ten million girls and young women from 150 countries. Girl Guiding and Girl Scouting transforms the lives of girls and young women worldwide, supporting and empowering them to achieve their fullest potential and become responsible citizens of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£7,382,000
Donations and legacies | £2.06m | |
Charitable activities | £4.93m | |
Other trading activities | £260.00k | |
Investments | £131.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,713,000
Raising funds | £1.74m | |
Charitable activities | £5.98m | |
Other | £0 |
£118,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.74m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.98m |
People

73 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Albania
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bolivia
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Brunei
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Colombia
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Grenada
- Guatemala
- Guinea
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jordan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kuwait
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Malta
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mexico
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Norway
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Qatar
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saint Vincent
- San Marino
- Senegal
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- South Africa
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- Venezuela
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 18 November 2014: CIO registration
- 11 November 2017: Funds received from 306125 WORLD ASSOCIATION OF GIRL GUIDES AND GIRL SCOUTS
- WAGGGS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Candela Gonzalez | Chair | 31 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharrada Segeran | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Wairimu Mwangi | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Marie Lejosne | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helga Herman Mutasingwa | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Signe Marie Obel | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Monika Dreik | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ahmad Hammoud | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Faniry Domohina Rakotoarivony | Trustee | 26 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chempaka Emalin Pahamin | Trustee | 14 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paula Carola Neher-Old | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stefanie Marie Argus | Trustee | 15 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Frances Bond | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Debra Teiko Nakatomi | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Maree Bradley | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Medhavi Chamathya Gihini Manik Fernando | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christiane Rouhana | Trustee | 31 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.88m | £8.00m | £4.79m | £8.36m | £7.38m | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.25m | £6.51m | £5.85m | £6.88m | £7.71m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.13m | £3.17m | £1.74m | £3.70m | £2.06m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £379.00k | £137.00k | £114.00k | £201.00k | £260.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.17m | £4.33m | £2.82m | £4.32m | £4.93m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £204.00k | £150.00k | £116.00k | £133.00k | £131.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £208.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £351.00k | £626 | £5.51k | £61.96k | £71.91k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.62m | £5.97m | £5.34m | £5.59m | £5.98m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £626.00k | £540.00k | £501.00k | £1.29m | £1.74m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £387.00k | £190.00k | £452.00k | £832.00k | £1.02m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £915.00k | £577.00k | £1.01m | £880.00k | £1.04m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £29.00k | £25.00k | £26.00k | £24.00k | £18.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.01m | £3.89m | £3.76m | £3.71m | £3.71m | |
|
Long-term investments | £5.30m | £4.29m | £4.93m | £4.11m | £4.14m | |
|
Other assets | £4.05m | £5.31m | £3.75m | £5.08m | £5.60m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.69m | £1.51m | £1.14m | £1.29m | £2.25m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 18 NOV 2014 AMENDED ON 21 SEP 2017 as amended on 24 Aug 2021 as amended on 31 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF WAGGGS IS TO FURTHER THE AIMS OF THE GIRL GUIDE/GIRL SCOUT MOVEMENT BY PROVIDING GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN WITH OPPORTUNITIES FOR SELF DEVELOPMENT THROUGH LEADERSHIP, RESPONSIBLE CITIZENSHIP AND SERVICE IN THEIR OWN AND WORLD COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
World Association of Girl Guides
& Girl Scouts (WAGGGS)
World Bureau
Olave Centre
12C Lyndhurst Road
London
- Phone:
- 02077941181
- Email:
- wagggs@wagggs.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window