A FRESH START COACHING AND TRAINING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Registered Training provider offering services to the local community that motivate, inspire and help raise participation while creating life lasting capacities for participants involved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Enfield
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- AFS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.93k | £65.73k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.86k | £69.18k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £49.90k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 29 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 19 February 2018 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
19 February 2018 | 19 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2016
(These accounts |
31 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN HERTFORDSHIRE AND NORTH LONDON BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY A. PROVIDING COMMUNITY EDUCATION B. PROVIDING TRAINING AND LIFE LONG LEARNING C. INCREASING THE KNOWLEDGE AND ABILITY OF INDIVIDUALS ABOUT A PARTICULAR SET OF SUBJECTS SUCH AS IT, ENGLISH, MATHS, BUSINESS ADMINISTRATION AND OTHERS. 3. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH VOLUNTEERING AND WORK EXPERIENCE OPPORTUNITIES. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY).
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window