CRITICAL ACCESS

Charity number: 1158214
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We work with universities to teach school children politics and philosophy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 August 2014: CIO registration
  • 06 July 2023: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 06 July 2023: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2022 13 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 13 April 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 17 March 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 30 March 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 March 2021 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 30 March 2021 303 days late