Financial history FRIENDS OF WMSBG-KOLEL DAMESEK ELIEZER

Charity number: 1160938
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £645.07k £588.33k £439.00k £729.70k £388.41k
Total expenditure £810.32k £200.55k £232.35k £522.00k £979.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £388.40k £383.95k N/A £594.12k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Investment £256.67k £204.38k N/A £135.58k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £746.48k £123.19k N/A £444.54k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £63.84k £77.36k N/A £77.46k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £5.43k £5.03k N/A £5.27k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £741.05k £118.17k N/A £439.28k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £63.84k £77.36k N/A £77.46k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 N/A