EMPOWERMENT THROUGH EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of the public with an emphasis on the advancement of education through the provision of financial and non financial support to individuals, educational institutions and other organisations with similar purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 22 October 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PIYUSH PATEL | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr FAIZUL MUMTAZ | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr SRIKANTH MANDUMULA | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.86k | £8.00k | £29.09k | £14.10k | £13.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.48k | £7.28k | £29.22k | £15.08k | £12.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 17 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 FEB 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITH AN EMPHASIS ON THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND NON FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS, EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 WOODSIDE PARK ROAD
LONDON
N12 8RT
- Phone:
- 02083438306
- Email:
- patelp268@aol.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window