PEMBROKE & MONKTON LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims of the organisation are to To establish a Local History Society in Pembroke and Monkton To raise public awareness of the heritage of these communities To research, record and disseminate the history of Pembroke and Monkton To encourage community participation To support Pembroke Museum
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 11 September 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LINDA ANNE ASMAN BSc CertEd | Chair | 27 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
roy smith | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANN ELIZABETH MORTENSON | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
vicki hagger | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
dennis goldsworthy | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
john hyam | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Rees | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Rose Blackburn | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
George Palmer | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jill Ensom | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Mary Lankshear | Trustee | 27 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
stuart asman BSC DIPCE | Trustee | 27 January 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.37k | £13.28k | £73.02k | £41.03k | £24.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.50k | £7.47k | £42.76k | £21.06k | £13.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 11 Sep 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORICAL HERITAGE OF PEMBROKE AND MONKTON, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, RAISING THE AWARENESS OF THE HERITAGE OF PEMBROKE AND MONKTON, RESEARCHING, RECORDING AND DISSEMINATING INFORMATION AND THE SUPPORT OF A MUSEUM IN THE TOWN OF PEMBROKE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Rocky Park
Pembroke
SA71 4NY
- Phone:
- 01646622428
- Email:
- pembrokehistory@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window