Governing document ALMAHDY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 MAY 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/10/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/01/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/01/2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS("OBJECTS")ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ORPHANS AND POOR CHILDREN AROUND THE WORLD, RELIEVING POVERTY AND PROVIDING EDUCATION TO WAR STRICKEN FAMILIES ESPECIALLY CHILDREN IN UK AND OVERSEAS AND TO ASSIST TALENTED AND POOR CHILDREN FOR HIGHER EDUCATION AND SUPPORT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.