Trustees SOCIAL LINK

Charity number: 1158743
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Craig Kaye Trustee 12 March 2025
None on record
Sarah-Louise Fox Trustee 11 September 2024
None on record
Christopher Thorn Trustee 25 July 2024
None on record
Claire Heloise Wheeler Trustee 23 November 2022
None on record
Carole Harvey Trustee 31 October 2018
None on record
GLYNIS WISEMAN Trustee 14 August 2014
None on record
JANET SHUTTLEWOOD Trustee 14 August 2014
None on record