Friends of Bedonwell Schools

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold 2 fairs annually, summer and Christmas time. We also hold cake sales, book sales, sweet cone sales and gift sales. We hold discos for all year groups and hold non-uniform days where children wear their own clothes for a £1 donation. We also have Christmas card designs for sale. All of this helps to raise important funds to expand the childrens' learning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Bexley
Governance
- 17 September 2014: Standard registration
- FBINS (Working name)
- FOBS (Working name)
- FBINS (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF BEDONWELL INFANT AND NURSERY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF BEDONWELL INFANTS AND NURSERY SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Hanson | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Smee | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Keeble | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Townsend | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.39k | £3.32k | £23.42k | £27.79k | £38.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.20k | £2.55k | £16.41k | £34.85k | £40.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 18 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/07/2013 as amended on 21 Mar 2022 as amended on 21 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY:DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bedonwell Infant & Nursery School
Bedonwell Road
BELVEDERE
DA17 5PF
- Phone:
- 0208 310 4161
- Email:
- fobsbedonwell@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window