MENADUE MANAGEMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Menadue Management Trust (MMT) is to promote the physical, mental, emotional and spiritual welfare of children, young people and adults and to advance their education, within a Christian environment, by developing, maintaining and managing Menadue Farm as a residential educational activity centre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 19 February 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS BARTLETT | Chair | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHIL CRANCH | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|||||
PHIL WILLCOCKS | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|||||
KEVIN RODNEY BARTLETT | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.00k | £90.07k | £127.71k | £138.62k | £143.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.50k | £64.65k | £45.82k | £51.82k | £85.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.10k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. THE PRIMARY OBJECT OF THE TRUST IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE, BY PROVIDING FACILITIES, ACCOMMODATION OR SERVICES FOR THAT PURPOSE. 2. THE SECOND OBJECT OF THE TRUST IS TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING FACILITIES, ACCOMMODATION OR SERVICES FOR THAT PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Peaslands Road
Sidmouth
EX10 9BD
- Phone:
- 01395515677
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window