GALGOS DEL SOL UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote humane behaviour towards galgos (Spanish greyhounds) in particular but not exclusively by the provision of grant funding and support to another registered charity Galgos del Sol Spain.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Spain
Governance
- 27 October 2014: CIO registration
- GDS UK (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jennifer Joy Cranton | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE SCOTT | Trustee | 27 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIMON CHARLES COX | Trustee | 27 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
TINA SOLERA | Trustee | 27 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAIME JOHN SOLERA | Trustee | 27 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.03k | £64.68k | £79.01k | £95.06k | £144.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.41k | £51.87k | £63.76k | £74.14k | £109.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 November 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Oct 2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS GALGOS (SPANISH GREYHOUNDS) IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, FUNDING AND SUPPORT TO ANOTHER REGISTERED CHARITY CALLED "GALGOS DEL SOL SPAIN".
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Chester Street
Swindon
SN1 5DX
- Phone:
- 07702557817
- Email:
- galgosdelsoluk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window