Financial history THE WOODLEY PRE-SCHOOL (READING)

Charity number: 1160756
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £134.67k £104.16k £107.83k £139.18k £131.60k
Total expenditure £78.40k £86.95k £85.99k £107.25k £100.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £94.80k £120.24k £102.11k