Financial history GOODRICH VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 505065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £13.91k £27.12k £23.05k £16.00k £19.05k
Total expenditure £17.94k £22.33k £12.70k £19.21k £22.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £18.23k £2.67k N/A