GOODRICH VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
VILLAGE HALL FACILITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 05 April 1976: Standard registration
- THE GOODRICH SOCIAL CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth David GORT | Chair | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Seth Oliver | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tobin James | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Mary CLARK | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philippe Edward BOBROFF | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michelle TIMEWELL | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah HARBORD | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lynn COLLETT | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Hazel PICKERING | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David BARTLE | Trustee | 18 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Diane Kay BARTLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.91k | £27.12k | £23.05k | £16.00k | £19.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.94k | £22.33k | £12.70k | £19.21k | £22.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.23k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 22 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 31 July 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 3 JUNE 1975 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 APRIL 2010
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GOODRICH, HEREFORDSHIRE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS O RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GOODRICH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lingen
Castle Lane
Goodrich
Ross-on-Wye
HR9 6HX
- Phone:
- 01600890162
- Website:
-
GOODRICHVILLAGEHALL.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window