Trustees GOODRICH VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Charity number: 505065

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth David GORT | Chair | 20 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Seth Oliver | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tobin James | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Heather Mary CLARK | Trustee | 06 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Philippe Edward BOBROFF | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michelle TIMEWELL | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah HARBORD | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lynn COLLETT | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Hazel PICKERING | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David BARTLE | Trustee | 18 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Diane Kay BARTLE | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.