INSTRUMENTS OF TIME AND TRUTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IT&T exists to further the knowledge and appreciation of Baroque and Classical music in students and the general public through teaching and performing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 November 2014: CIO registration
- IT&T (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Wigmore | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Julie Alexandra Evelyn Curtis | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael Stinton | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER NURSE | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Nigel Doggett | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Sir Jonathan Phillips | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Byrt | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Efstathios Kedros | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr BRITTANY WELLNER JAMES | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.45k | £133.79k | £234.77k | £166.54k | £147.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.19k | £135.54k | £217.19k | £176.95k | £156.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON AMENDED ON 14 APR 2016
Charitable objects
INSTRUMENTS OF TIME AND TRUTH EXISTS TO FURTHER THE KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF BAROQUE AND CLASSICAL MUSIC IN STUDENTS AND IN THE GENERAL PUBLIC, THROUGH TEACHING AND PERFORMING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 DUNSTAN ROAD
HEADINGTON
OXFORD
OX3 9BY
- Phone:
- 07966582662
- Email:
- info@timeandtruth.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window