GLYNCORRWG AFC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteer Village football club reformed from 2018 after 2 seasons out of league due to player shortage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 10 November 2014: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL ENOCH | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.14k | £10.00k | £2.50k | £770 | £9.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.31k | £0 | £3.62k | £1.41k | £1.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 August 2024 | 568 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 August 2024 | 568 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 August 2024 | 933 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 August 2024 | 933 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 August 2024 | 1298 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 August 2024 | 1298 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 10 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GLYNCORRWG BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Glyncorrwg Hall
33-35 Cymmer Road
Glyncorrwg
PORT TALBOT
West Glamorgan
SA13 3AB
- Phone:
- 01639852499
- Email:
- michaelenoch6@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window