ABACUS COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING IN ESSEX BY PROVIDING, DEVELOPING AND MAINTAINING AN AFFORDABLE AND ACCESSIBLE COUNSELLING SERVICE, WITH RELEVANT AND ASSESSED SUPPORT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Southend-on-sea
- Thurrock
Governance
- 06 October 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LESLEY ANN BUTCHER | Chair | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Williams | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Buck | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Joan Lewis | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
David James Bannister | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS ANTHONY CHARD B.Sc MBACP | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANICE LYONS | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.81k | £9.45k | £7.87k | £32.74k | £18.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.93k | £3.92k | £10.74k | £17.47k | £22.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.46k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE LIVING IN SOUTH ESSEX BY PROVIDING, DEVELOPING AND MAINTAINING AN AFFORDABLE AND ACCESSIBLE COUNSELLING SERVICE.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
EVANGELICAL CHURCH
WEST ROAD
SHOEBURYNESS
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS3 9EF
- Phone:
- 07910 261780
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window