Trustees FERRYSIDE SOCIAL ENTERPRISE GROUP

Charity Number: 1158602
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Julie Elizabeth McKenzie Chair 23 October 2024
None on record
Roseanne Blackwell McPhail Trustee 15 January 2025
None on record
Irfanullah Safi Trustee 23 October 2024
None on record
Dorothy Ann Morris Trustee 15 May 2024
None on record
James Greenwell Trustee 11 June 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Margaret Gibson Trustee 18 April 2023
None on record
Charles Robert Donald Etty-Leal Trustee 18 October 2021
None on record