CHRIST EXALTED CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 06 August 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Naana Nkrumah | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Maynard Ferguson | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
EMMA OBRENYAH | Trustee | 06 August 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.34k | £82.24k | £96.37k | £67.73k | £98.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.54k | £60.08k | £40.99k | £66.71k | £103.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 04 September 2024 | 96 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 07 December 2023 | 190 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 December 2022 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 02 December 2022 | 185 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 10 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 29 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 29 November 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 06 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Natwest
40A Market Street
WELLINGBOROUGH
Northamptonshire
NN8 1AD
- Phone:
- 07940171229
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window