DROYLSDEN & DISTRICT FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve persons in Droylsden area in financial hardship in such other ways as the trustees from time to time think fit, in particular, but not exclusively by: a) providing emergency food, essential toiletries, and household items to those in need b) the provision of support or signposting
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tameside
Governance
- 02 December 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev JOHN HEMSWORTH | Chair | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Ellis | Trustee | 24 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Alison Ferriday | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Shaw | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Catterall | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
GWENETH BARR | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN FEELEY | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
GIOVANNA PALMIERI | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
VERONICA WARRINGTON | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.03k | £25.53k | £7.00k | £12.60k | £5.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.57k | £4.56k | £1.37k | £3.84k | £9.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 02 Dec 2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN DROYLSDEN AND LOCAL SURROUNDING AREAS THAT ARE IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 WILLOW FOLD
DROYLSDEN
MANCHESTER
M43 7BY
- Phone:
- 07473452813
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window