HEREFORD GOSPEL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hereford Gospel Trust has the following charitable purpose: The advancement of the Christian religion for the public benefit including the carrying on of the service of God in accordance with the Old and New Testaments of the Holy Bible as followed by those Christians forming part of a world-wide fellowship known as the Plymouth Brethren Christian Church ("The Brethren").
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 01 December 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Boyman | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Garth Knappett | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Doouss | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN PAUL TENNENT | Trustee | 18 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY KNAPPETT | Trustee | 18 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.36k | £45.43k | £87.89k | £191.78k | £198.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.35k | £64.48k | £94.24k | £71.15k | £149.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2020
(These accounts |
16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07 OCT 2004 AS AMENDED BY A DEED OF VARIATION DATED 28/02/2014
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INCLUDING BY THE CARRYING ON OF THE SERVICE OF GOD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE OLD AND NEW TESTAMENTS OF THE HOLY BIBLE AS FOLLOWED BY THOSE CHRISTIANS FORMING PART OF A WORLDWIDE FELLOWSHIP KNOWN AS THE "PLYMOUTH BRETHREN CHRISTIAN CHURCH" (THE "BRETHREN") WHOSE CORE DOCTRINE IS SUMMARISED IN SCHEDULE 1 TO THIS DEED AND WHOSE PROPER PRACTICES IN FURTHERANCE OF SOME ASPECTS OF THAT CORE DOCTRINE ARE SUMMARISED IN SCHEDULE 2 TO THIS DEED(?FAITH IN PRACTICE?); AND (B) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH BRETHREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 BEACON ROAD
ROTHERWAS INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
HEREFORD
HR2 6JF
- Phone:
- 02083917620
- Email:
- info@hereforduk.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window