Accounts and annual returns PHOENIX UNITED FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1160371
Charity reporting is overdue by 1502 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 41 days
Annual return 01 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 406 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 406 days
Annual return 01 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 772 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 772 days
Annual return 01 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1137 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1137 days
Annual return 01 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1502 days
Accounts and TAR 01 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1502 days