Trustees THE SHEFFIELD FIRTH ALMSHOUSES
Charity number: 1159083

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIE LOUISE SHIELD | Chair | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Graeme Beck | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Bailey | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Jane Holmes | Trustee | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Jeffrey CARD | Trustee | 04 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Peter Lomas | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Ruth DOYLE | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RICHARD TOM GAUNT | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA NOLLENT | Trustee | 28 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.