Financial history ROWHEDGE UNDER 5'S

Charity number: 1159138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £83.01k £95.35k £127.40k £143.09k £129.28k
Total expenditure £87.71k £94.13k £123.60k £141.81k £146.09k
Income from government contracts £62.17k £86.81k N/A £115.97k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A