ROWHEDGE UNDER 5'S

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rowhedge Under 5's pre-school runs for 8 sessions a week at a local village hall. We offer places to children aged 2 to 4 years old.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chloe Greenwold | Chair | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grace Gray | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katie Mcmullen | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Ling | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lillie Hardy-Sims | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Marie Daniel | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Selina Jane Lyons | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Southernwood | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Steele | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Ann Sharp | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Allan Wainwright | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Clayfield | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Hewson | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.01k | £95.35k | £127.40k | £143.09k | £129.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.71k | £94.13k | £123.60k | £141.81k | £146.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £62.17k | £86.81k | N/A | £115.97k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 10 Nov 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS BY:(1)OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE,CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY;(2) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS;(3) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Rectory Road
Rowhedge
Colchester
Essex
CO5 7HR
- Phone:
- 07809448997
- Email:
- chair@rowhedgeunder5s.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window