Trustees ROWHEDGE UNDER 5'S
Charity number: 1159138

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chloe Greenwold | Chair | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Grace Gray | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katie Mcmullen | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Ling | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lillie Hardy-Sims | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Marie Daniel | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Selina Jane Lyons | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Southernwood | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Steele | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Ann Sharp | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Allan Wainwright | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Clayfield | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Hewson | Trustee | 03 February 2023 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.