Financial history EPILEPSY LIFESTYLE

Charity number: 1158587
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/09/2017 16/09/2018 16/09/2019 16/09/2020 16/09/2021
Total gross income £22.73k £54.81k £19.58k £9.84k £0
Total expenditure £32.63k £52.65k £20.13k £10.78k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A