Financial history YORK CHAMBER MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1161416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.46k £15.31k £18.95k £14.65k £18.39k
Total expenditure £18.46k £15.31k £18.95k £14.65k £15.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A