YORK CHAMBER MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of chamber music in York in a short festival. It includes outreach work with young musicians, educational masterclasses and a competition for young musicians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of York
Governance
- 24 April 2015: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM LOWE | Chair | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT GAMMON | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|||||
ALISON GAMMON | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ray Walker | Trustee | 31 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stella Waller | Trustee | 31 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr STUART LOWE | Trustee | 02 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.46k | £15.31k | £18.95k | £14.65k | £18.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.46k | £15.31k | £18.95k | £14.65k | £15.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 March 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 24 Apr 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF CLASSICAL MUSIC (CHAMBER MUSIC) IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY HOLDING AN ANNUAL FESTIVAL OF CHAMBER MUSIC TO INCLUDE FREE MASTER CLASSES, CONCERTS, WORKSHOPS AND COMPETITIONS IN YORK AND ITS HINTERLAND AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AIMED AT YOUNG PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VILLA
TOLLERTON
YORK
YO61 1QQ
- Phone:
- 07525757531
- Email:
- drsglowe@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window