KNITWIZZNEEDLES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
we were fortunate enough to be given a free space in southwark within a Cafe which consisted of large space for members. we were able to meet 2 weekly to allow for more members joining. The group started in April 2016 and ended in September 2016. we are now in the position of seeking a new venue.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 15 August 2014: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORRAINE DUNCAN | Chair | 15 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE FERLISI | Trustee | 15 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.76k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £835 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1203 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1568 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Aug 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE IN SOUTHWARK AND SURROUNDING AREAS FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR AGE, DISABILITY, GENDER, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR, OLDER WOMEN. 2. TO PROMOTE THE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONGST ELDERLY PERSONS IN SOUTHWARK AND SURROUNDING AREAS, WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY BECAUSE THEY ARE HOUSEBOUND OR ARE UNABLE TO EASILY DRIVE OR ACCESS PUBLIC TRANSPORT. 3. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE LEARNING FOR PLEASURE BY PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME EMPLOYMENT THROUGH THE CONTINUED DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR INDIVIDUAL COMPETENCIES, SKILLS, AND UNDERSTANDING IN SUBJECTS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE. IN PARTICULAR, BY: -PROVIDING A KNITTING AND CROCHETING GROUP THAT ENABLES MEMBERS OF THE OLDER POPULATION WHO ARE WOMEN, TO INTERACT SOCIALLY IN ORDER TO REDUCE SOCIAL ISOLATION AND PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY: -PROVIDING A TRANSPORT SERVICE TO AND FROM THE KNITTING GROUP: - ENABLING OLDER PEOPLE TO ACCESS AND USE THE INTERNET TO DOWNLOAD AND UPLOAD PATTERNS: -RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING OLDER ISOLATED WOMEN BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 13
Malt House
62 Sancroft Street
LONDON
SE11 5NG
- Phone:
- 07463050553
- Email:
- lozzie36@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window