Accounts and annual returns BEDFORD GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity Number: 1159076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 12 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 10 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 10 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 08 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 08 February 2023 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 05 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window