Financial history BEDFORD GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1159076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £146.26k £52.35k £50.39k £38.42k £21.15k
Total expenditure £75.77k £79.47k £51.01k £68.82k £73.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A