Financial history DUNHAM HILL TRUST

Charity number: 1159239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £94.82k £94.82k £48.54k £48.34k £59.87k
Total expenditure £78.93k £78.93k £58.57k £72.19k £93.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A