BEXLEY VILLAGE WOMENS INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the main purposes of the WI organisation are: a)to advance the education of women and girls for the public benefit in all areas. b) to promote sustainable development for the public benefit, c)to promote health for the public benefit and d)to advance citizenship for the public benefit by the promotion of civic responsibility and volunteering.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bexley
Governance
- 02 October 2014: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA LADBROOK | Chair | 09 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Noelle GURNEY | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine THOMAS | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jackeline PERRY | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine PRESTON | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Irene Leach | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GAYNOR DAVIDSON | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNA BENTON | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WEIGHILL | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA WELLARD | Trustee | 09 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.60k | £0 | £1.39k | £11.49k | £6.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.57k | £480 | £1.34k | £9.82k | £5.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JUN 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FEDERATION ARE TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE ORGANISATION IN (INSERT AREA SERVED BY THE FEDERATION) AND ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Cold Blow Crescent
Bexley
DA5 2DR
- Phone:
- 01322559520
- Email:
- susiebee1958@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
thewi.org.uk/westkent
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window