THE HOLT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objectives are to promote education for people under the age of 25 and relieve those in need by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage by paying grants to enable such persons to participate in amateur sport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 September 2014: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Holt OBE | Chair | 22 May 2014 |
|
|||||
ANGELA RAMONA BURNETT | Trustee | 22 May 2014 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM RICHARD HOWARD HOLT | Trustee | 14 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.63k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.88k | £216 | £1.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 MAY 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE HOLT TRUST ARE:- FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (1) PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND (2) RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, BY PAYING GRANTS TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO PARTICIPATE IN AMATEUR SPORT, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO GRANTS TO FUND TRAVEL EXPENSES, ENTRY FEES, THE PURCHASE OF EQUIPMENT, HIRE OF FACILITIES, PAYMENT OF COACHES, REFEREES, MEDICAL AND OTHER SUPPORT STAFF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
68 Vincent Square
London
SW1P 2NU
- Phone:
- 01242 285895
- Email:
- bob.holt@bobholt.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window