Trustees SUDBURY METHODIST CHURCH
Charity number: 1165218

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Nigel Stuart wright | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Persaud | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
George Sabaratnam | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Eugene Atiemoh | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAWN WILKES | Trustee | 16 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Walker | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAISY WALKER | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sabrina NewelL | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emmagine Frederick | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clair Gyesi | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Veronica Persaud | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leandro Thomas Kelly | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
PAULETTE NEWELL | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
VIVAN KOOMSON | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joan Ellis | Trustee | 20 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY PERSAUD | Trustee | 02 January 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.