THE CHELTENHAM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement and support of education, culture, arts and heritage including the provision of museums, galleries, events and activities. The provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation in the interest of social welfare. The promotion of good health and wellbeing through community and public participation in healthy recreation and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£8,301,878
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £5.98m | |
Other trading activities | £2.21m | |
Investments | £108.11k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£8,159,192
Raising funds | £1.79m | |
Charitable activities | £6.37m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £611,281 from 1 government contract(s) and £321,639 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.79m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.37m | |
Retained for future use | £142.69k |
People

208 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 18 September 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mike Napier | Chair | 25 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Brewster | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Andrews | Trustee | 30 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Martin | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Goldsworthy | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Bond | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Wilson | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Barbara Clark | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Averis | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Taylor | Trustee | 02 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clive Rawlings | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Narey | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kate Peden | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sunita Nelson | Trustee | 03 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.27m | £4.54m | £8.14m | £7.79m | £8.30m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.38m | £4.24m | £7.32m | £8.12m | £8.16m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.03m | £955.24k | £936.02k | N/A | £611.28k | |
|
Income from government grants | £203.43k | £927.24k | £1.57m | £1.10m | £321.64k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £14.23k | £29.69k | £9.48k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.12m | £826.06k | £2.12m | £2.58m | £2.21m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.12m | £3.68m | £6.01m | £5.21m | £5.98m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.26k | £27 | £0 | £2.68k | £108.11k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.50m | £3.69m | £5.38m | £6.13m | £6.37m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £873.16k | £547.20k | £1.93m | £1.99m | £1.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £12.55k | £13.50k | £0 | £13.43k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £106.67k | £77.37k | £114.75k | £223.13k | £212.72k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.96m | £2.14m | £2.88m | £2.68m | £3.59m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.21m | -£2.73m | -£1.74m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.03m | £1.86m | £1.64m | £1.91m | £2.68m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/07/2014 as amended on 23 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATION, CULTURE, ARTS, AND HERITAGE INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF LIBRARIES, MUSEUMS, GALLERIES, LEARNING AND INFORMATION CENTRES, ARCHIVES, ACTIVITIES, EVENTS, PROGRAMMES AND OTHER RELATED SERVICES, AND/OR 2. THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE SUCH FACILITIES BEING PROVIDED TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE SAVE THAT SPECIAL FACILITIES MAY BE PROVIDED TO PERSONS WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES MAY HAVE NEED OF SPECIAL FACILITIES AND SERVICES, AND/OR 3. THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AND WELLBEING THROUGH COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION AND ACTIVITIES UNDERTAKEN PURSUANT TO OBJECTIVES 1 AND 2 AND /OR 4. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE PUBLIC CONSISTENT WITH THE OBJECTS ABOVE AS THE DIRECTOR TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE. WITHIN ENGLAND AND WALES (THE "OBJECTS").
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cheltenham Trust
Town Hall
Imperial Square
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL50 1QA
- Phone:
- 01242256024
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window