Financial history LIME WALK GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1159751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £191.70k £114.73k £184.70k £148.56k £246.21k
Total expenditure £124.29k £137.27k £168.03k £201.22k £300.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A