Accounts and annual returns LOOSE ENDS

Charity number: 1160508
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2020 02 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 02 October 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2019 02 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 02 January 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2018 30 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required