Financial history LOOSE ENDS

Charity number: 1160508
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £16.00k £16.07k £20.78k £30.35k £48.77k
Total expenditure £11.81k £10.31k £15.79k £14.28k £20.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A