Financial history WHEATRIDGE GOSPEL HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1159656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £180.62k £192.62k £197.84k £180.51k £654.20k
Total expenditure £116.74k £116.74k £134.42k £169.98k £193.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £648.41k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.71k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.08k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £193.58k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £13.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.28k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0