Financial history NORTH WALES SUPERKIDS

Charity number: 1159804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £45.07k £39.23k £42.35k £69.07k £38.24k
Total expenditure £41.59k £27.86k £44.60k £43.82k £28.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A