Trustees POTTON HALL FOR ALL
Charity Number: 1158751

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Smith | Chair | 18 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Judy Oliver | Trustee | 07 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dick Knifton | Trustee | 02 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Price Williams | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Craig Gant | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
KIM GUTTERIDGE | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Phill Banks | Trustee | 14 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.