Accounts and annual returns PEEK A BOO TRUST

Charity number: 1160002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 08 January 2025 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 August 2024 210 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 August 2024 210 days late
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 February 2023 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 March 2022 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 19 March 2021 47 days late Download Open in new window