PEEK A BOO TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Peek a Boo Trust raise fund via walks, runs, Charity Awards dinner and canine related events. This is to raise funds for both Animal and Children's charities in the UK. We have supported Charities that are both large and small and to date have donated over £100,000.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 January 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GAVIN ROBERTSON | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.75k | £5.33k | £225 | £35.87k | £59.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.44k | £8.04k | £405 | £22.15k | £42.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
28 August 2024 | 210 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 February 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 March 2022 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 March 2021 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/08/2014
Charitable objects
(I)TO RELIEVE AND ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS (PARTICULARLY DOGS) AND CHILDREN WHETHER THAT BE SUFFERING BE DISEASE, ABUSE, LIFE LIMITING CONDITION OR, IN THE CASE OF CHILDREN POVERTY. (II) TO SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN WORK WHICH MEETS THE OBJECTS SET OUT IN (I) ABOVE INCLUDING EDUCATIONAL INITIATIVES (III)THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE MET PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR BY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.APPROXIMATELY SIXTY PERCENT OF THE GRANTS WILL BE IN RESPECT OF ANIMALS AND FORTY PERCENT IN RESPECT OF CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Avalon House
Benson
WALLINGFORD
Oxfordshire
OX10 6PP
- Phone:
- 07768825430
- Email:
- FREECLOUD1@AOL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window