BALLOON WOOD ADVENTURE PLAYGROUND ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 22 April 1976: Standard registration
- 04 April 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- BALLOON WOODS PLAYCENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 05 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JANUARY 1976 AS AMENDED 15 MARCH 1976
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE THE PROVISION OF FACILITES FOR LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONFOR CHILDREN RESIDENT IN BALLOON WOOD AND SURROUNDING AREAS BEING FACILITIES:- (A) OF WHICH SUCH CHILDREN HAVE BEEN BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; AND (B) WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING.
Area of benefit
BALLOON WOOD AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window