Financial history BURY ST EDMUNDS CONCERT BAND

Charity number: 1160092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.70k £9.21k £5.57k £8.00k £10.88k
Total expenditure £17.84k £1.47k £3.48k £6.97k £8.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A