Financial history MIT FOUNDATION (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1158803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £546.56k £1.73m £1.34m £5.43m £405.52k
Total expenditure £496.15k £1.79m £1.34m £5.43m £397.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £546.51k £1.73m £1.34m £5.43m N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £52 £59 £70 £78 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £496.15k £1.79m £1.34m £5.43m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.25k £7.05k £0 £48.22k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £491.90k £1.79m £0 £5.38m N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A