THE KOREAN CHURCH LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects are to advance the Christian faith for the benefit of the public and to further such charitable purposes for the public benefit as are exclusively charitable according to the laws of England & Wales as the trustees may from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 19 November 2014: Standard registration
- USED TO BE CALLED 'THE INTERNATIONAL PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH (KOREAN CHURCH BRANCH)' (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND BYUNG HEON YOO | Chair | 10 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dong Kyu Kim | Trustee | 12 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
DONG SOO LEE | Trustee | 12 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
HWAN OK YOO | Trustee | 10 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.79k | £197.12k | £194.34k | £159.42k | £163.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.54k | £124.27k | £120.74k | £147.66k | £205.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2023 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2023 | 364 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2023 | 729 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2023 | 1094 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2023 | 1094 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/08/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/11/2014
Charitable objects
3.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. 3.2 TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Korean Church London
37 Grove Crescent
Kingston upon Thames
KT1 2DG
- Phone:
- 07799001711
- Email:
- kclondon37@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window